This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/15/2023 at 00:46:04 (UTC).

In re Z.H. et al.; CFS v. D.J.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 In re Z H CFS filed an Other lawsuit against D J. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mapes, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0283

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mapes, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

D. J.

Not Yet Classified

Z. H.

T. J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Emily Paige Uhre

Attorney at Attorney at Law

4967 Newport Avenue, Suite 12-Pmb #119

San Diego, CA 92107

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel with exhibit form attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Emily Paige Uhre for Mother; Time to file AOB extended to Feb 14, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (74 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (252 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: 2 minute orders dtd Nov 21, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: 2 minute orders dtd Nov 21, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Nov 29, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Nov 29, 2022; D.J. (Mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J293501; Trial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J293500; Trial Court Judge: Mapes, Steven

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Paige Uhre