This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/10/2021 at 00:26:15 (UTC).

In re Y.H.; CFS v. L.G.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 In re Y H CFS filed an Other lawsuit against L G. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alexander, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7634

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alexander, Erin

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Appellant and Defendant

L. G.

Not Yet Classified

Y. H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Linda S. Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1, R-1 (343 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: minute order dtd Jun 30, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel with exhibit form attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Linda Rehm for Father.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Jun 20, 2021 and appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Aug 27, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Aug 27, 2021; L.G. (Father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J288720; Trial Court Judge: Alexander, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda S. Rehm