This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/31/2023 at 00:19:39 (UTC).

In re X.C.; CFS v. D.C.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 In re X C CFS filed an Other lawsuit against D C. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Poncin, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0631

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Poncin, Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Appellant and Defendant

D. C.

Not Yet Classified

X. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

William H. Hook

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed as abandoned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: proposed order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: no supplemental brief filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Appellant granted 30 days to file a supplemental brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: D. C. Attorney: William H. Hook

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: D. C.Attorney: William H. Hook

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (385 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-2 (66 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel w/ Exhibit Form attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty William Hook for Mother

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Feb 02, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Feb 02, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Feb 02, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Feb 02, 2023; D.C. (Mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J293777; Trial Court Judge: Poncin, Lynn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less