This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/09/2022 at 02:22:32 (UTC).

In re VERNON EVANS on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 In re VERNON EVANS on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1237

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Vernon Evans

San Quentin, CA 94974

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioners reply due +15 after response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Response filed:; Notes: AG's response due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Response filed:. Requested for 09/02/2022 By 30 Day(s) to ext response to 9/2/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of habeas corpus filed on June 29, 2022 has been read and considered. The Attorney General is directed to file and serve an informal response to the petition within 15 days of this order. Petitioner's reply is due 15 days after the filing of the response. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.385(b).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant