This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/19/2022 at 15:14:21 (UTC).

In re TERRY PARKER EALES on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 In re TERRY PARKER EALES on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5965

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Terry Parker Eales

Corcoran, CA 93212

Respondent

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John L. Staley

Attorney at Attorney at Law

12463 Rancho Bernardo Road No. 372

San Diego, CA 92128-2143

Respondent Attorneys

Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Jamie A. Scheidegger

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition - opposition to petition. Due on 06/22/2022 By 30 Day(s) Respondent granted to 06/22/22 to file informal response.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition - opposition to petition. Requested for 06/22/2022 By 30 Day(s) Respondent requesting to 06/22/22 to file informal response.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition - opposition to petition. Due on 05/23/2022 By 32 Day(s) Respondent granted to 05/23/22 to file informal response.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition - opposition to petition. Requested for 05/23/2022 By 32 Day(s) Respondent requesting to 05/23/22 to file informal response.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.; Notes: Opposition to be served and filed by 04/21/22. Reply if any, due 15 days thereafter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: By petitioner with material attached. Filed with deficiencies.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamie A. Scheidegger