This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/14/2023 at 12:03:51 (UTC).

In re TERRY MORRIS on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 In re TERRY MORRIS on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Magno, Teresa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9545

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Magno, Teresa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Terry Morris

Delano, CA 93216

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Marilee Marshall

20 North Raymond Ave. Suite 240

Pasadena, CA 91103

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Teresa P. Magno

Compton Courthouse 210 W Compton Blvd, Dept F

Compton, CA 90220

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

John Yang

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S Spring St., Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Order to show cause issued return before trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order granting order to show cause.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed April 7, 2022, the informal response filed July 27, 2022, and the reply to the informal response filed August 4, 2022. Petitioner has made a prima facie showing of an entitlement to an order to show cause and evidentiary hearing with respect to his claim that the People failed to disclose witness Ebony Sampson's arrest for felony forgery and any agreement or understanding with respect to prosecution of that offense. Accordingly, the Director of the Department of Corrections is ordered to show cause in a return before the superior court, why the relief prayed for in the petition should not be granted. (See People v. Duvall (1995) 9 Cal.4th 464, 474-475; People v. Romero (1994) 8 Cal.4th 728, 737; In re Lawler (1979) 23 Cal.3d 190, 194; In re Hochberg (1970) 2 Cal.3d 870, 873-876; People v. Banner (1992) 3 Cal.App.4th 1315, 1325; In re Lower (1979) 100 Cal.App.3d 144, 152-153). The clerk of this court is directed to send the Los Angeles Superior Court copies of the petition, the Attorney General's informal response, petitioner's reply to the informal response, and this order to show cause. Upon receipt of these documents, the court is directed to cause the petition to be filed as a proceeding on habeas corpus, to set a date for the filing of a return, to appoint counsel for petitioner if he is unable to retain counsel (People v. Burton (1978) 21 Cal.3d 513, 519, fn. 3), and to conduct further proceedings in accordance with California Rules of Court, rule 4.551(d)-(g), People v. Duvall, supra, 9 Cal.4th at pages 474-479, and In re Hochberg, supra, 2 Cal.3d at pages 873-874. The petition is denied in all other respects.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Informal Reply to informal response to petition for writ of habeas corpus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: An informal response was filed on July 27, 2022, in the above-entitled matter. Petitioner has until August 11, 2022, to file a reply to the informal response (California Rules of Court, rule 8.385(b)(3).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Respondent: The People Attorney: John Yang Two extensions granted for a total of 43 days: 06/21/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 07/19/2022 By 29 Day(s) 06/22/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 07/19/2022 By 29 Day(s) 07/19/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 08/19/2022 By 31 Day(s) 07/19/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 08/02/2022 By 14 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: John Yang; Notes: Two extensions granted for a total of 43 days: 06/21/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 07/19/2022 By 29 Day(s) 06/22/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 07/19/2022 By 29 Day(s) 07/19/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 08/19/2022 By 31 Day(s) 07/19/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 08/02/2022 By 14 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: [The court does not intend to grant further continuances]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed April 7, 2022. The Attorney General is directed to file an informal response to the petition within 30 days of the date of this order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.; Notes: Habeas corpus.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hon. Teresa P. Magno

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Yang