This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/18/2022 at 04:33:29 (UTC).

In re T.C., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 In re T C , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bubis, Gary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0529

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bubis, Gary

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Appellants, Not Yet Classified and Defendants

T. C.

C. H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

5530 Overland Avenue, Suite 170

San Diego, CA 92123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-3 (653 pages); RT-10 (140 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed June 21, 2022 by Mother Juvenile Fast Track Case (EJ4570(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed June 16, 2022 by father Juvenile Fast Track Case (EJ4570(A))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ4570; Trial Court Judge: Bubis, Gary

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency is a litigant