This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/27/2022 at 17:10:48 (UTC).

In re STANLEY CHING on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 In re STANLEY CHING on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richman, Craig. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0369

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Richman, Craig

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Stanley Ching

Respondents

The People

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Carlos Yguico

Attorney at Gemmill, Baldridge & Yguico, LLP

815 Moraga Dr., Suite 303

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Respondent Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 210 W. Temple St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed on February 16, 2021. Petitioner has failed to demonstrate the superior court erred or that he is otherwise entitled to extraordinary relief. Accordingly, the petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition. Volume 2 of 2.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less