This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/06/2021 at 00:16:48 (UTC).

In re S.L. et al.; DPSS v. L.L.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 In re S L DPSS filed an Other lawsuit against L L. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cho, Susanne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7647

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cho, Susanne

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Appellant and Defendant

L. L.

Not Yet Classified

S. L.

S. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange St., Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3674

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Appeal dismissed as untimely.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd May 11, 2021 and appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Aug 31, 2021; L.L. (Father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: INJ2000063; Trial Court Judge: Cho, Susanne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riverside County Department of Public Social Services is a litigant