This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/28/2022 at 00:23:48 (UTC).

In re S.J., on Habeas Corpus.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 In re S J , on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Yep, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1817

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Yep, Brian

 

Party Details

Petitioner

S. J.

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Brian Yep

The People

Probation Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Megan Nicole Gallow

Attorney at Los Angeles County Public Defender

210 W. Temple Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Mark Christian Wynn

Attorney at Ofc of the Alternate Public Defender

210 W. Temple St. 18Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Children's Court

201 Centre Plaza Drive

Monterey Park, CA 91754-2158

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Kenneth M. Von Helmolt

Attorney at Office of the District Attorneys Office

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Justin William Clark

Attorney at Lawrence Beach Allen & Choi, PC

150 S Los Robles Ave Suite 660

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingDescription: Traverse to return filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Written return filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Written return filed. Due on 10/28/2022 By 58 Day(s) [ THE COURT: The extension of time is granted to October 28, 2022. Any traverse is due November 30, 2022. The hearing on the order to show cause is continued to January 2023. The clerks will notify the parties of the specific time and date. ]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Written return filed. Requested for 10/28/2022 By 58 Day(s) [ Probation Department's application for extension of time to file the return to the order to show cause ]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: Reporter's transcript of proceedings from July 21,2022. [One volume]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Issued order to show cause.; Notes: TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed July 26, 2022 and the People's response filed July 29, 2022. Petitioner has made a prima facie showing of an entitlement to an order to show cause. Accordingly, the Probation Department is ordered to show cause before this court in its courtroom at 300 South Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90013, on 2 or November 3, 2022 (specific date and time to be noticed at a later date), why the relief prayed for in the petition should not be granted. (See People v. Duvall (1995) 9 Cal.4th 464, 474-475; People v. Romero (1994) 8 Cal.4th 728, 737; In re Lawler (1979) 23 Cal.3d 190, 194; In re Hochberg (1970) 2 Cal.3d 870, 873-876; People v. Banner (1992) 3 Cal.App.4th 1315, 1325; In re Lower (1979) 100 Cal.App.3d 144, 152-153). The return to the order to show cause, if any, shall be filed on or before August 31, 2022. A traverse, if any, shall be filed on or before September 30, 2022. The juvenile court is directed to release petitioner from detention pending disposition of this proceeding. (In re Smiley (1967) 66 Cal.2d 606, 613; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 5.752(b), (e)(1), (f), (i); Welf. & Inst. Code, 632, subd. (c).) Nothing in this order precludes the juvenile court from imposing conditions on petitioner's release that the court concludes are reasonably necessary.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Respondent: The People Attorney: Kenneth M. Von Helmolt Attorney: Office of the District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Kenneth M. Von Helmolt Attorney: Office of the District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The People are directed to file an informal response to the petition for writ of habeas corpus, filed July 26, 2022, by no later than Friday July 29, 2022 at noon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.; Notes: Juvenile Criminal Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Stay Requested)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Probation Department is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth M. Von Helmolt