This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/02/2022 at 19:54:59 (UTC).

In re SAUL TERRELL on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 In re SAUL TERRELL on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sahagun, Raul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7655

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sahagun, Raul

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Saul Terrell

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mohammed Wael Aly

Attorney at Unite the People, Inc.

555 E Ocean Blvd Ste 205

Long Beach, CA 90802

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Raul Anthony Sahagun

Norwalk Courthouse 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Dept. D

Norwalk, CA 90650

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of habeas corpus, filed January 19, 2022, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of habeas corpus, filed January 19, 2022, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Supplemental POS on trial court judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Notice of non-compliance emailed to petitioner's counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.; Notes: Habeas corpus.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hon. Raul Anthony Sahagun