This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/01/2021 at 18:14:14 (UTC).

In re RONALD DAVE RENTERIA on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 In re RONALD DAVE RENTERIA on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominguez, Juan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7333

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dominguez, Juan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ronald Dave Renteria

San Diego, CA 92179

Respondents

The People

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Frank Duncan

Attorney at Attorney At Law

880 West First Street Suite 602

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Respondent Attorneys

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Hon. Juan Carlos Dominguez

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. [S265600]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: The petition for writ of habeas corpus filed September 3, 2020, has been read and considered and is denied for failure to demonstrate entitlement to habeas relief. (People v. Duvall (1995) 9 Cal.4th 464, 474-475; see also People v. Benson (1998) 18 Cal.4th 24, 26 ["when a court has stayed sentence on an otherwise qualifying conviction under section 654, the stayed conviction may be treated as a strike."].)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Petitioner Ronald Renteria substitutes in pro per in place of Frank Duncan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Petitioner Ronald Renteria substitutes Frank Duncan as counsel of record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less