This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/03/2022 at 02:32:15 (UTC).

In re R.K.; DPSS v. R.K.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 In re R K DPSS filed an Other lawsuit against R K. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mapes, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9743

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mapes, Steven

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendant, Not Yet Classified and Appellant

R. K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Sarah Marie Vaona

340 South Lemon Avenue, #6192

Walnut, CA 91789

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingDescription: Cause submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Appellant granted 30 days to file suppl brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: R. K. Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Due Date: 11/30/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: R. K.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: R. K.Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (30 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (276 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel with exhibit form attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Sarah Marie Vaona for Father

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: minute order dtd Aug 15, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: minute order dtd Aug 15, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Sep 7, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Sep 7, 2022; R.K.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J291268; Trial Court Judge: Mapes, Steven

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Marie Vaona