This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/11/2022 at 00:11:01 (UTC).

In re R.B.; DPSS v. M.B.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 In re R B DPSS filed an Other lawsuit against M B. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cho, Susanne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8331

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cho, Susanne

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Appellant and Defendant

M. B.

Not Yet Classified

R. B.

Other

D. S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange St., Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3674

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Terence M. Chucas

1455 Frazee Road, Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed as abandoned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: proposed order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: no supplemental brief filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Appellant granted 30 days to file a supplemental brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: M. B. Attorney: Terence M. Chucas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: M. B.Attorney: Terence M. Chucas

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (64 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Terence Chucas for appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel with exhibit form attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute orders dtd Dec 9, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Amended clerk's notification of filing notice of appeal dtd Jan 7, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: County clerk extension granted.; Notes: To Jan 24, 2022 to submit record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute orders dtd Dec 9, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Jan 6, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Jan 4, 2022; M.B. (mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: INJ2100185; Trial Court Judge: Cho, Susanne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riverside County Department of Public Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terence M. Chucas