This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/10/2022 at 14:37:21 (UTC).

In re PHILLIP ANTHONY BURNETT on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 In re PHILLIP ANTHONY BURNETT on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ryan, William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7669

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ryan, William

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Phillip Anthony Burnett

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Marc Eric Norton

Attorney at Law Office Marc Eric Norton

P. O. Box 162

Zamora, CA 95698

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. [S273709]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: [S273709]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of habeas corpus, filed January 20, 2022, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of habeas corpus, filed January 20, 2022, has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Criminal Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Vol 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.; Notes: Criminal Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick Bennett