This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 03/09/2022 at 21:15:45 (UTC).

IN RE P.D.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 IN RE P D was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0320

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

P. D.

Not Yet Classified

Sixth District Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Elizabeth Winsor Hereford

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Patrick Hoynoski

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Sixth District Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/15/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: P. D. Attorney: Patrick Hoynoski

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Sixth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: H047650; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: JV43744

[+] Read More [-] Read Less