This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/11/2022 at 17:08:50 (UTC).

In re PAUL SOUTER on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 In re PAUL SOUTER on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Finigan, Jeffrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6115

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Finigan, Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Paul Souter

Respondent

The People

Others

New Mexico Correction Department Division of Probation and Parole

Attn: Melanie Martinez, Director P.O. Box 27116

Santa Fe, NM 87502-0116

San Mateo County Superior Court

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

First District Appellate Project

475 Fourteenth Street, Suite 650

Oakland, CA 94612

Steven Alan Torres

Attorney at Torres & Torres

3579 E Foothill Blvd Pmb 332

Pasadena, CA 91107

Michael Joseph Hroziencik

Attorney at Law Office of Michael Hroziencik

611 Veterans Boulevard Suite 108

Redwood City, CA 94063

Rachel D. Belden

Attorney at First District Appellate Project

475 14Th Street, Suite 650

Oakland, CA 94612

Respondent Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Office of District Attorney

400 County Center

Redwood City, CA 94063

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Reply in support of petition, from Rachel Belden, attorney for Paul Souter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed to:; Notes: Informal response; from the Attorney General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Consideration of whether to issue an order to show cause herein is deferred pending consideration of the related appeal in case No. A161941. The Attorney General may serve and file points and authorities in response to the petition on or before October 3, 2022, addressed to the question of whether an order to show cause should issue, and if so, whether the Attorney General anticipates that the return and traverse will raise factual issues that require resolution at an evidentiary hearing, making this matter more appropriate for issuance of an order to show cause returnable in the superior court. (People v. Duvall (1995) 9 Cal.4th 464, 474-479.) Petitioner may serve and file reply points and authorities on or before October 17, 2022. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.385(b).) No extensions of time for briefing are contemplated. Petitioner's request for judicial notice of the record on appeal is denied as unnecessary. (See In re Reno (2012) 55 Cal.4th 428, 484 ["Petitioners need not separately or specifically request judicial notice of all documents connected with their past appeals and habeas corpus proceedings, as in capital cases this court routinely consults prior proceedings irrespective of a formal request."].) The court advises the parties that the oral argument notice issued in the companion appeal will not operate to permit oral argument on the habeas corpus petition, absent issuance of an order to show cause returnable in this court. The clerk shall file a copy of this order in case No. A161941, and serve this order upon the Deputy Attorney General assigned to case No. A161941, as well as all counsel in the consolidated appeal, People v. Lujan, case No. A162047.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits A - C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.; Notes: Related Appeal Pending: No. A161941

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: 16SF009515A; Trial Court Judge: Finigan, Jeffrey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN MATEO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT CLERKS is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases where New Mexico Corrections Department (NMCD) is a litigant