This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/31/2023 at 08:34:08 (UTC).

IN RE PAUL M. MAHONEY ON CONTEMPT

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 IN RE PAUL M MAHONEY ON CONTEMPT was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9418

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Appellant

Salsbury Engineering, Inc.

Respondents, Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Consolidated Contracting Services, Inc.

Paul M. Mahoney

Claremont, CA 91711

Other

Los Angeles County Public Defender

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Richard A. Soll

Attorney at Mahoney & Soll LLP

150 West First Street, Suite 180 P.O .Box 940

Claremont, CA 91711

Paul M. Mahoney

Attorney at Mahoney & Soll, LLP

150 West First Street, Suite 180

Claremont, CA 91711

Todd E. Lundell

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7689

Michael J. Baker

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Respondent, Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Todd E. Lundell

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7689

Michael J. Baker

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Other Attorney

Mark George Harvis

Attorney at Office of the Public Defender

320 West Temple Street, Suite 590

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: Corrigan, J., was absent and did not participate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Salsbury Engineering, Inc. Attorney: Paul M. Mahoney G057832 and G057966 are consolidated per the Court of Appeal order of November 18, 2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received oversized petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Salsbury Engineering, Inc. Attorney: Paul M. Mahoney Attachments are oversized, no $710 filing fee, correction on cover page. Counsel requested to resubmit.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G057966 G057832 (lead); Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2015-00789263

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less