This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/03/2020 at 13:52:59 (UTC).

IN RE N.E.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 IN RE N E was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2133

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Appellant, Not Yet Classified and Defendant

N. E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer K. Magee

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Linda K. Harvie

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Christina Z. Beede

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/02/2020

DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: N. E. Attorney: Linda K. Harvie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2020

DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2020

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2020

DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: N. E. Attorney: Linda K. Harvie (Based on the Third District Court of Appeal Implementation Order filed on April 17, 2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2020

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C089476; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: JVSQ15249; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: JVSQ15250

[+] Read More [-] Read Less