This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/21/2022 at 03:16:47 (UTC).

In re A.M.; CFS v. D.M.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 In re A M CFS filed an Other lawsuit against D M. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mapes, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9415

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mapes, Steven

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

D. M.

Not Yet Classified

M. R.

A. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Elizabeth Cregan Alexander

P.O. Box 34337

San Diego, CA 92163

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Partial, as to minor M.R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (61 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (455 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Amended dtd Jul 27, 2022, removing J286863

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel with Exhibit Form attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Elizabeth C. Alexander for appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Jul 13, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Partial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The appeal as to M.R. (J286863) is dismissed as untimely, and this appeal shall be limited to minor A.M. only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute orders dtd Mar 15, 2022, Apr 22, 2022, Jul 13, 2022 and appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Jul 21, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Jul 21, 2022; A.M. (Mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J286864; Trial Court Judge: Mapes, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Cregan Alexander