This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/02/2022 at 00:58:40 (UTC).

In re M.L., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 In re M L , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Imhoff, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0339

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Imhoff, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Defendant and Appellant

W. L.

Not Yet Classified

M. L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

5530 Overland Avenue, Suite 170

San Diego, CA 92123

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Paul Adam Swiller

Attorney at Tot Law

1901 First Avenue, Suite 228

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF. Due on 07/22/2022 By 30 Day(s) No further extensions are contemplated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Counsel appointment order mailed to appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-2 (533 pages); RT-26 (222 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Paul A. Swiller for appellant father

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed April 22, 2022 by Father Juvenile Fast Track Case (J520379(A))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J520379; Trial Court Judge: Imhoff, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J520379A; Trial Court Judge: Imhoff, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Adam Swiller