This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/03/2023 at 18:03:01 (UTC).

In re MARCELLO COOPER on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 In re MARCELLO COOPER on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5610

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Marcello Cooper

Lancaster, CA 93539-8457

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 210 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT:* Both the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed on December 19, 2022, and the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed on January 13, 2023, have been read and considered. Both are denied without prejudice. (See, e.g., In re Barnett (2003) 31 Cal.4th 466, 472-473 [when a defendant exercises his right to professional counsel, it is counsel who is in charge of the case].) The clerk of the court is ordered to send a copy of this order and both petitions to petitioner's counsel at the California Innocence Project as well as to petitioner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* Both the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed on December 19, 2022, and the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed on January 13, 2023, have been read and considered. Both are denied without prejudice. (See, e.g., In re Barnett (2003) 31 Cal.4th 466, 472-473 [when a defendant exercises his right to professional counsel, it is counsel who is in charge of the case].) The clerk of the court is ordered to send a copy of this order and both petitions to petitioner's counsel at the California Innocence Project as well as to petitioner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less