This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/04/2022 at 00:41:21 (UTC).

In re L.V.; CFS v. I.M. et al.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 In re L filed an Other lawsuit against CFS. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pace, Annemarie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9001

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pace, Annemarie

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Appellants and Defendants

I. M.

M. C.

Not Yet Classified

L. V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (18 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (31 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd May 23, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: minute order dtd May 13, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Notice of appeal re appealability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd May 13, 2022; I.M. and M.C. (maternal caregivers)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J287502; Trial Court Judge: Pace, Annemarie

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant