This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/26/2022 at 01:20:11 (UTC).

In re L.O.; DPSS v. L.O.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 In re L O DPSS filed an Other lawsuit against L O. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, Cheryl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9511

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Murphy, Cheryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Defendant, Not Yet Classified and Appellant

L. O.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange St., Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3674

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Paul Adam Swiller

Attorney at Tot Law

1901 First Avenue, Suite 228

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: L. O. Attorney: Paul Adam Swiller

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: AOB; wrong county listed on cover

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 12/19/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Riverside County Department of Public Social ServicesAttorney: Office of the County Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: L. O.Attorney: Paul Adam Swiller

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (525 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: regarding blank pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (116 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: CSR: Burks, Karen Lee (7703) Extended Due Date: 09/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel with exhibit form attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Paul A. Swiller for appellant; AOB due Sep. 26, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: CSR: Gamulao, Jennifer Ruth (11689) Extended Due Date: 09/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Jul 19, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Jul 19, 2022 and appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Aug 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Aug 1, 2022; L.O. (father)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIJ2000607; Trial Court Judge: Murphy, Cheryl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riverside County Department of Public Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Adam Swiller