This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/25/2023 at 04:11:35 (UTC).

In re K.N.; CFS v C.D. et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 In re K N CFS filed an Other lawsuit against C D. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mapes, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0292

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mapes, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Appellants and Defendants

C. D.

V. V.

Not Yet Classified

K. N.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Donna B. Kaiser

Sarah Marie Vaona

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed as abandoned.; Notes: As to both appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: Proposed order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: No supplemental brief was filed by appellant re: Sade C. as to both appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Appellant C.D. is personally granted 30 days to file any supplemental brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: C. D. Attorney: Donna B. Kaiser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: C. D.Attorney: Donna B. Kaiser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Sarah Vaona is appointed for appellant V.V.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel w/transmission of exhibits form for appellant C.D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Donna Kaiser is appointed for appellant C.D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Dec 5, 2022; Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Nov 02 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Nov 02 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Dec 1 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Dec 1 2022; V.V. (Father)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Dec 1 2022; C.D. (Mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J292237; Trial Court Judge: Mapes, Steven

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less