This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/03/2023 at 12:00:16 (UTC).

In re Keith Loker on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 In re Keith Loker on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brodie, Kyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0498

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Brodie, Kyle

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Keith Thomas Loker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The State Attorney General

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Marta Maria VanLandingham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/20/2023

DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: Office of the federal public defender is confirmed as counsel for Loker in these proceedings. Counsel requests appointment of adjunct counsel for the limited purpose of determining whether there are claims under Penal Code section 1509.1, subdivision (b) of ineffective assistance of trial counsel that were not raised in the habeas proceedings below. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.397.) The request for appointment of adjunct counsel is granted in principle. While the appointment of adjunct counsel appears to be required, this court cannot identify adjunct counsel for this appeal at this time. Appeal is stayed pending further order, as this court is not in the position to appoint and/or compensate counsel necessary for the prosecution of this appeal, and to which appellant is entitled.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Prop 66 order - stay?

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketDescription: Order on Certificate of Appealability (Death Penalty); Notes: The request for certificate of appealability filed in this court on Mar 7, 2023, is granted as to Claim 1 only. Request is denied as to the remainder of the claims.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Certificate of appealability was filed on March 7, 2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketDescription: Certificate of Appealability Request (Death Penalty); Notes: (per order of Jan 20, 2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: dtd Mar 3, 2023; Keith Thomas Loker (per order of Jan 20, 2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketDescription: Certificate of Appealability from Trial Court (Death Penalty); Notes: Order denying certificate of appealability; dtd Feb 3, 2023. See this court's order of Jan 20, 2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Reissued Order Dismissing Habeas Corpus as Successive; dtd Feb 03, 2023. See this court's order of Jan 20, 2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: To create an appealable order, the trial court is directed to reissue its ruling on the petition before Feb 6, 2023, and "grant or deny a certificate of appealability concurrently" with that ruling as required by the statutory subdivision that creates the appellate right. (Pen. Code, 1509.1, subd. (c).) Appellant may file a new notice of appeal from that ruling. We will consolidate the two appeals to ensure that appellant's rights are preserved. Appellant may also file a new request for a certificate of appealability in this court at that time.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: dtd Jan 19, 2023; Amended

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: dtd Jan 18, 2023; amended clerk's notification of filing notice of appeal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Notice of appeal- Prop 66

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: dtd Jan 12, 2023; Keith Thomas Loker

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CHCJS2000001; Trial Court Judge: Brodie, Kyle

[+] Read More [-] Read Less