This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/25/2022 at 02:00:23 (UTC).

In re K.C., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 In re K C , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bubis, Gary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9780

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bubis, Gary

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Defendant and Appellant

A. P.

Not Yet Classified

K. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

5530 Overland Avenue, Suite 170

San Diego, CA 92123

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Linda Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Marsden transcript filed.; Notes: RT Vol. 8 RT Vol. 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-3 (741 pages); RT-12 (86 pages) * RT vols. 8 and 9 are Marsden transcripts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Linda Rehm for appellant mother

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12-9-21 by mother (EJ4071A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - El Cajon; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ4071A; Trial Court Judge: Bubis, Gary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - El Cajon; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ4071; Trial Court Judge: Bubis, Gary

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda S. Rehm