This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/19/2023 at 05:07:36 (UTC).

In re J.V. et al.; CFS v. V.V.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 In re J filed an Other lawsuit against CFS. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alexander, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0294

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alexander, Erin

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendants, Appellants and Not Yet Classified

V. V.

J. V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Johanna R. Shargel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed as abandoned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: supplemental brief and record on appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: V. V.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: V. V.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice granted.; Notes: Appellant's Jan 27, 2023, request is granted and court takes judicial notice of the Nov 10, 2022, unpublished opinion in E078618, a copy of which is attached to the request.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: appellant's request for judicial notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (36 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (165 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: minute orders dtd Oct 26, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Dec 2, 2022; Amended prior E078618

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Dec 2, 2022; Prior E078618

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Dec 2, 2022; Prior E077522

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Dec 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Dec 2, 2022; V.V. (father)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J288234; Trial Court Judge: Alexander, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less