This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/05/2023 at 03:41:18 (UTC).

In re J.V. et al.; CFS v. V.V.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 In re J filed an Other lawsuit against CFS. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alexander, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0294

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alexander, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendants, Appellants and Not Yet Classified

V. V.

J. V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Johanna R. Shargel

2632 Wilshire Blvd., #284

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: Cause submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: To court.; Notes: appellant's request for judicial notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: any oppo to appellant's request for judicial notice shall be filed within 15 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: by appellant(exhibit - 16 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Appellant is granted 30 days to file supp brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: V. V. Attorney: Johanna R. Shargel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: appellant's request for judicial notice; pagination and bookmarks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (36 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (165 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: minute orders dtd Oct 26, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Dec 2, 2022; Amended prior E078618

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Dec 2, 2022; Prior E078618

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Dec 2, 2022; Prior E077522

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Dec 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Dec 2, 2022; V.V. (father)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J288234; Trial Court Judge: Alexander, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Johanna R. Shargel