This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/02/2022 at 00:30:15 (UTC).

In re JUSTIN MARCUS ZINMAN on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 In re JUSTIN MARCUS ZINMAN on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wright, Ryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3883

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wright, Ryan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Justin Marcus Zinman

Delano, CA 93216

Respondent

Ventura County Superior Court

Hon. Ryan Wright 800 S. Victoria Ave.

Ventura, CA 93003

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

800 South Victoria Avenue 3Rd Floor Hoj

Ventura, CA 93009

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Something is due; see note.; Notes: Check status of related appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Consideration of petition is deferred pending appeal.; Notes: [SEE ORDER] . . . We defer resolution of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed by Justin Marcus Zinman on July 29, 2021, pending resolution of the appeal currently pending in People v. Zinman, 2d Crim. No. B313764.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 2021001112; Trial Court Judge: Wright, Ryan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT/ is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant