This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/25/2022 at 17:02:12 (UTC).

In re J.R. et al.; CFS v. J.R.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 In re J R CFS filed an Other lawsuit against J R. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alexander, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9787

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alexander, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendant, Not Yet Classified and Appellant

J. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Neale B. Gold

402 West Broadway, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Applnt's copy of counsel appointment order; unable to forward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel w/exhibit form attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Neale Gold for Father; time to file AOB extended to Nov 30, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (35 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (215 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute Orders dtd Sep 8, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute Orders dtd Sep 8, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Sep 15, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Sep 15, 2022; J.R. (Father)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J293539; Trial Court Judge: Alexander, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J293538; Trial Court Judge: Alexander, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J293541; Trial Court Judge: Alexander, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J293540; Trial Court Judge: Alexander, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neale B. Gold