This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/09/2023 at 10:04:39 (UTC).

In re J.R.; CFS v. K.C.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 In re J R CFS filed an Other lawsuit against K C. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pace, Annemarie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0234

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pace, Annemarie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

K. C.

Not Yet Classified

J. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Sarah Marie Vaona

340 S. Lemon Avenue, #6192

Walnut, CA 91789

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed as abandoned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: proposed order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: No supp brief by appellant re Sade C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Appellant is granted 30 days to file supp brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: K. C. Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: K. C.Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel w/request for transmission of exhibits form.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Sarah Vaona is appointed for the appellant. AOB due date is extended to Jan 18, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (79 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (577 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: minute order dtd Nov 22 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Nov 22 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Nov 22 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Nov 22 2022; K.C. (Mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J267529; Trial Court Judge: Pace, Annemarie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less