This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/01/2023 at 04:07:57 (UTC).

In re J.R., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 In re J R , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cumba, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1506

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cumba, Mark

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

P. H.

Not Yet Classified

J. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Melissa Chaitin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final After examination of the record, appellant P.H.'s appointed counsel filed a brief indicating there are no arguable issues. Appellant's request that this court exercise its discretion to review the record for error and permit the filing of a supplemental brief are DENIED. Because no claim of error or other defect has been raised in this matter, the appeal filed on January 19, 2023 is DISMISSED. (In re Sade C. (1996) 13 Cal.4th 952, 994.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: After examination of the record, appellant P.H.'s appointed counsel filed a brief indicating there are no arguable issues. Appellant's request that this court exercise its discretion to review the record for error and permit the filing of a supplemental brief are DENIED. Because no claim of error or other defect has been raised in this matter, the appeal filed on January 19, 2023 is DISMISSED. (In re Sade C. (1996) 13 Cal.4th 952, 994.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: P. H. Attorney: Melissa Chaitin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: P. H.Attorney: Melissa Chaitin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: Clerk's-1 (304) and Reporter's-8 (60)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Melissa Chaitin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed by father on 1/25/23 (EJ4709)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ4709; Trial Court Judge: Cumba, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less