This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/05/2022 at 23:01:45 (UTC).

In re JOSE ORTEGA on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 In re JOSE ORTEGA on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3172

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jose Ortega

Lancaster, CA 93539-8457

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 210 West Temple Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: We have read and considered the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed September 15, 2022. The petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Non-compliance sent to Petitioner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant