This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/30/2022 at 00:42:31 (UTC).

In re JONATHAN DANIEL VOS on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 In re JONATHAN DANIEL VOS on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Otto, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0430

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Otto, James

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jonathan Daniel Vos

Coalinga, CA 93210

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. James D. Otto

Los Angeles Superior Court 210 W. Temple St.

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Petitioner's amended proof of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final We have read and considered the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed on May 19, 2022. Petitioner does not state a prima facie case for relief. (See People v. Duvall (1995) 9 Cal.4th 464, 475.) Accordingly, the petition is denied. STRATTON, P.J. GRIMES, J. HARUTUNIAN, J.* *Judge of the San Diego County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed on May 19, 2022. Petitioner does not state a prima facie case for relief. (See People v. Duvall (1995) 9 Cal.4th 464, 475.) Accordingly, the petition is denied. STRATTON, P.J. GRIMES, J. HARUTUNIAN, J.* *Judge of the San Diego County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Notice of non compliance for lack of service on Attorney General and Superior Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.; Notes: Habeas corpus.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hon. James D. Otto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick Bennett