This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/23/2023 at 05:19:15 (UTC).

In re J.M., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 In re J M , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dumanis, Bonnie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1508

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dumanis, Bonnie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

L. M.

Not Yet Classified

J. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Lauren Kelly Johnson

 

Court Documents

D081508

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Remanded to trial court with directions; Disposition Type: Final The juvenile court's order terminating parental rights is conditionally reversed. The matter is remanded to the juvenile court with directions to comply with the inquiry provisions of ICWA and section 224.2 (and, if applicable, the notice provisions under 224.3). If, after completing its inquiry, neither the Agency nor the juvenile court has reason to believe or reason to know that J.M. is an Indian child, the order terminating parental rights shall be reinstated. If the Agency or the juvenile court has reason to believe or reason to know J.M. is an Indian child, the juvenile court shall proceed accordingly. The remittitur shall issue immediately.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: O'Rourke, Terry B.; Participants: Castillo, Jose Scher (Concur) Do, Truc T. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The juvenile court's order terminating parental rights is conditionally reversed. The matter is remanded to the juvenile court with directions to comply with the inquiry provisions of ICWA and section 224.2 (and, if applicable, the notice provisions under 224.3). If, after completing its inquiry, neither the Agency nor the juvenile court has reason to believe or reason to know that J.M. is an Indian child, the order terminating parental rights shall be reinstated. If the Agency or the juvenile court has reason to believe or reason to know J.M. is an Indian child, the juvenile court shall proceed accordingly. The remittitur shall issue immediately.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Cause submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: CASE FULLY BRIEFED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Joint Stipulation for Immediate Issuance of Remittitur

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Respondent's Concession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Augmented record filed.; Notes: CT-1/13pgs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: L. M. Attorney: Lauren Kelly Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: L. M.Attorney: Lauren Kelly Johnson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: Appellant's motion to augment the record on appeal is GRANTED. The Clerk of the San Diego County Superior Court is directed to prepare and transmit to this court a supplemental transcript as outlined in the attached motion. Copies of the augmentation shall be furnished to all counsel of record. THE SUPPLEMENTAL TRANSCRIPT IS DUE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the Appellant's Opening Brief is DENIED because it is unaccompanied by an agreement that any additional time granted may be deducted from the period provided under California Rules of Court, rules 8.220(a), 8.412(b)(5), and 8.416(a)(2) and (g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: Appellant. EOT included.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: Ct-2/337pgs., RT-6/1514pgs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Lauren Johnson for Mother

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed January 24, 2023 by Mother Juvenile Fast Track Case (J520671)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J520671; Trial Court Judge: Dumanis, Bonnie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less