This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/30/2023 at 04:07:37 (UTC).

In re J.K., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 In re J K , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bejarano, Marissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1509

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bejarano, Marissa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

S. M.

Not Yet Classified

J. K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Neale Bachmann Gold

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: CASE FULLY BRIEFED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: S. M. Attorney: Neale Bachmann Gold

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: S. M.Attorney: Neale Bachmann Gold

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: 4-24-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency Attorney: Office Of The County Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: S.D. County Health & Human Services AgencyAttorney: Office Of The County Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: S. M. Attorney: Neale Bachmann Gold

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: S. M.Attorney: Neale Bachmann Gold

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-2 (316 pages); RT-8 (91 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Neale B. Gold for appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed January 23, 2023 by Mother Juvenile Fast Track Case (J520626)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J520626; Trial Court Judge: Bejarano, Marissa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less