This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/15/2022 at 05:06:48 (UTC).

In re J.G.; CFS v. A.L.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 In re J G CFS filed an Other lawsuit against A L. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mapes, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9244

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mapes, Steven

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

A. L.

Not Yet Classified

J. G.

Other

. H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Mansi H. Thakkar

864 Grand Avenue, #866

San Diego, CA 92109

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (62 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (398 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel with exhibit form attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Mansi Thakkar for Father.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: amended notification of filing notice of appeal; dtd Jun 27, 2022(This court only)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: amended notification of filing notice of appeal; dtd Jun 27, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: minute order dtd Jun 6, 2022(J286545 Justice Amour Gilbert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Amended dtd Jun 23, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Jun 22, 2022 and apeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Jun 22, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd June 22, 2022; A.L. (father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J286545; Trial Court Judge: Mapes, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mansi H. Thakkar