This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/21/2022 at 05:40:36 (UTC).

In re J.B., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 In re J B , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pulos, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0107

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pulos, Michael

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Defendants and Appellants

A. H.

M. B.

Not Yet Classified

J. B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

5530 Overland Avenue, Suite 170

San Diego, CA 92123

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Michelle D. Pena

Attorney at Law Office of Michelle D. Pena

3830 Valley Centre Dr. Suite 705, Pmb 706

San Diego, CA 92130

Paul Adam Swiller

Attorney at Tot Law

1901 First Avenue, Suite 228

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

D080107

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed/part, rev/part, remanded w/direction; Disposition Type: Final The March 3, 2022 order is conditionally reversed. The matter is remanded to the juvenile court with directions to comply with the inquiry provisions of ICWA and section 224.2. If, after completing ICWA inquiry, neither the Agency nor the juvenile court has reason to know that J.B. is an Indian child, the court shall reinstate the findings and orders previously entered on March 3, 2022. If, after an adequate inquiry, the Agency or juvenile court has reason to know E.M. is an Indian child, the juvenile court shall proceed accordingly.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Haller, Judith L.; Participants: Aaron, Cynthia G. (Concur) O'Rourke, Terry B. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The March 3, 2022 order is conditionally reversed. The matter is remanded to the juvenile court with directions to comply with the inquiry provisions of ICWA and section 224.2. If, after completing ICWA inquiry, neither the Agency nor the juvenile court has reason to know that J.B. is an Indian child, the court shall reinstate the findings and orders previously entered on March 3, 2022. If, after an adequate inquiry, the Agency or juvenile court has reason to know E.M. is an Indian child, the juvenile court shall proceed accordingly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE FULLY BRIEFED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: A. H. Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: M. B. Attorney: Paul Adam Swiller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. H.Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: M. B.Attorney: Paul Adam Swiller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Appellant A.H./15 (conditional)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: A. H. Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. H.Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: No Further

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: No Further

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-3/827pgs., RT-11/3080pgs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty. Paul Swiller for appellant father.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed by father on 3/21/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty. Michelle Pena for appellant mother.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 3/7/22 by mother (J519899)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J519899; Trial Court Judge: Pulos, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle D. Pena

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Adam Swiller