This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/22/2022 at 14:34:01 (UTC).

In re JASON MENCY on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 In re JASON MENCY on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Horan, Charles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6559

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Horan, Charles

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jason Mency

Ione, CA 95640

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 210 W Temple St

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Petitioner's supplemental points and authorities received on December 16, 2021 returned to appellant. Included another copy of denial order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of habeas corpus filed on November 24, 2021 has been read and considered and is denied as largely repetitive of the appeal in case B301966, which is currently pending before the California Supreme Court. To the extent petitioner purports to raise other issues as well, the identifiable issues are repetitive of claims made and rejected in prior petitions. If petitioner seeks to raise new issues, he has failed to justify the delay and to state them clearly in order to establish a prima facie case for habeas relief. (See In re Clark (1993) 5 Cal.4th 750, 797-798; People v. Duvall (1995) 9 Cal.4th 464, 474.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of habeas corpus filed on November 24, 2021 has been read and considered and is denied as largely repetitive of the appeal in case B301966, which is currently pending before the California Supreme Court. To the extent petitioner purports to raise other issues as well, the identifiable issues are repetitive of claims made and rejected in prior petitions. If petitioner seeks to raise new issues, he has failed to justify the delay and to state them clearly in order to establish a prima facie case for habeas relief. (See In re Clark (1993) 5 Cal.4th 750, 797-798; People v. Duvall (1995) 9 Cal.4th 464, 474.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.; Notes: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant