This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/22/2022 at 00:45:32 (UTC).

The People v. Pisano

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Pisano. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pham, Cheri and Steiner, Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1032

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judges

Pham, Cheri

Steiner, Scott

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

The People

The Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon. Cheri Pham, Dept. C-5 700 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Petitioner

James Jordan McClain

Corcoran, CA 93212

Defendant and Appellant

William Anton Pisano

Santa Ana, CA 92703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office Of The State Attorney General

P O Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Michael Dodd Butera

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 West Broadway Ste 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Office Of The District Attorney

300 N. Flower Street P. O. Box 808

Santa Ana, CA 92703

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Sally P. Brajevich

9461 Charleville Blvd., #315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 06/08/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: William Anton Pisano Attorney: Sally P. Brajevich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/08/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Office Of The State Attorney General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: William Anton PisanoAttorney: Sally P. Brajevich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sealed document filed******; Notes: 2 sealed envelopes: RT Dated 12/16/21 RT Dated 12/20/21 Scanned and placed in sealed cabinet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 1 CT (149 pages) & 1 RT (215 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Sally P. Brajevich is appointed as counsel on appeal for appellant. This case will be independent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR/ J. Messer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Appellant William Anton Pisano Sentence: 16 months state prisonCopy of NOA sent to AG & ADI

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sally P. Brajevich