This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/27/2022 at 00:49:49 (UTC).

In re I.R.; DPSS v. S.N.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 In re I R DPSS filed an Other lawsuit against N. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mathis, Michele. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8088

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mathis, Michele

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Appellant and Defendant

S. N.

Not Yet Classified

I. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange St., Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3674

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Linda S. Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Applnt granted 30 days to file supp brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: S. N. Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Due Date: 02/23/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: S. N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: S. N.Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Augmented clerk's transcript filed; Notes: C-1 per 8.340 letter rec'd Dec 20, 2021 (11 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Marsden transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 dtd Aug 5, 2021 (16 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (76 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (488 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel with exhibit form attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Linda Rehm for Mother.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Nov 15, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Nov 15, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Nov 18, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Nov 17, 2021; S.N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIJ2000592; Trial Court Judge: Mathis, Michele

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riverside County Department of Public Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda S. Rehm