This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/17/2022 at 00:19:12 (UTC).

In re I.G., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 In re I G , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pulos, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0227

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pulos, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Defendant and Appellant

N. W.

Not Yet Classified

I. G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

5530 Overland Avenue, Suite 170

San Diego, CA 92123

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Michelle D. Pena

Attorney at Law Office of Michelle D. Pena

3830 Valley Centre Dr. Suite 705, Pmb 706

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

D080227

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Reversed & remanded to trial court w/directions; Disposition Type: Final The jurisdictional and dispositional orders issued on February 24, 2022 are conditionally reversed and the matter is remanded to the juvenile court with directions that within 30 days of the remittitur the Agency must file a report demonstrating its compliance with the inquiry provisions of ICWA and section 224.2, subdivision (b) and, if required, conduct further inquiry under section 224.2, subdivision (e). Within 45 days of the remittitur, the juvenile court must conduct a hearing to determine if the Agency's inquiry satisfied its statutory duty of inquiry. The juvenile court has the discretion to adjust these time periods on a showing of good cause. If neither the Agency nor the juvenile court has reason to believe or to know that I.G. is an Indian child, the orders issued on February 24, 2022, shall be reinstated. Alternatively, if after completing the inquiry the Agency or the juvenile court has reason to believe that I.G. is an Indian child, the court shall proceed accordingly.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: O'Rourke, Terry B.; Participants: Dato, William S. (Concur) Irion, Joan K. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The jurisdictional and dispositional orders issued on February 24, 2022 are conditionally reversed and the matter is remanded to the juvenile court with directions that within 30 days of the remittitur the Agency must file a report demonstrating its compliance with the inquiry provisions of ICWA and section 224.2, subdivision (b) and, if required, conduct further inquiry under section 224.2, subdivision (e). Within 45 days of the remittitur, the juvenile court must conduct a hearing to determine if the Agency's inquiry satisfied its statutory duty of inquiry. The juvenile court has the discretion to adjust these time periods on a showing of good cause. If neither the Agency nor the juvenile court has reason to believe or to know that I.G. is an Indian child, the orders issued on February 24, 2022, shall be reinstated. Alternatively, if after completing the inquiry the Agency or the juvenile court has reason to believe that I.G. is an Indian child, the court shall proceed accordingly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Errata filed to:; Notes: Respondent's motion to dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE FULLY BRIEFED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Respondent's Conditional Concession Letter in lieu of RB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Respondent's motion to augment the record on appeal and dismiss the appeal as moot will be considered concurrently with the appeal. The time to file the respondent's brief is extended to July 5, 2022. Last extension.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Appellant mother's oppo. to motion to augment record and request to dismiss appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: And request to dismiss. Respondent. Docs. attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: No Further

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: N. W. Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: N. W.Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty. Michelle Pena for appellant mother. AOB extended to 5/13/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-1/218pgs., RT-4/423pgs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed March 10, 2022 by Mother Juvenile Fast Track Case EJ4712

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ4712; Trial Court Judge: Pulos, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle D. Pena