This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/17/2022 at 03:08:33 (UTC).

In re I.D. et al.; DPSS v. R.J. et al.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 In re I D DPSS filed an Other lawsuit against R J. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rushton, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8788

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rushton, Michael

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Appellants and Defendants

R. J.

M. D.

Not Yet Classified

I. D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange St., Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3674

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Linda S. Rehm

P.O. Box 9937

Brea, CA 92822

Lauren Kelly Johnson

Attorney at Law Office of Lauren K. Johnson, A.P.L.C.

19200 Von Karman Avenue Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 09/06/2022 By 33 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: R. J. Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: R. J.Attorney: Linda S. Rehm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising that augmented record has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmented reporter's transcript filed; Notes: R-1 (12 pages) per CRC, Rule 8.340

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmented clerk's transcript filed; Notes: C-1 (98 pages) per CRC, Rule 8.340

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: M. D., Defendant and Appellant Lauren Kelly Johnson, CA appointed attorney - independent to 14 days after supplemental record is filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: M. D., Defendant and Appellant Lauren Kelly Johnson, CA appointed attorney - independent to 14 days after supplemental record is filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Jun 22, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (247 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel w/transmission of exhibits form.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Linda Rehm is appointed for appellant R.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Feb 4, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute Order dtd Feb 4, 2022 and Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Apr 4, 2022; Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Apr 4, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Apr 1, 2022; M.D. (father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Apr 1, 2022; R.J. (mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: SWJ2100325; Trial Court Judge: Rushton, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riverside County Department of Public Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren K. Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda S. Rehm