This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/12/2023 at 09:08:33 (UTC).

In re H.O. et al., Juvenile

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 In re H O , Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Willis III, Browder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1352

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Willis III, Browder

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Defendant and Appellant

S. G.

Not Yet Classified

H. O.

A. S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

5530 Overland Avenue, Suite 170

San Diego, CA 92123

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Sarah Marie Vaona

340 S. Lemon Avenue #6192

Walnut, CA 91789

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • HearingDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: S. G. Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Due Date: 03/29/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: S.D. County Health & Human Services AgencyAttorney: Office Of The County Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: S. G.Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT - 2 (532 pages), RT - 8 (209 pages), Confidential Envelope - 1 (Psych Eval)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: CSR: Hohn, Sandra A (11832) Extended Due Date: 01/13/2023Last extension

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed December 14, 2022 by Mother Juvenile Fast Track Case (J521048(A-B))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J521048; Trial Court Judge: Willis III, Browder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J521048A-B; Trial Court Judge: Willis III, Browder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less