This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/16/2023 at 03:09:22 (UTC).

In re HENRY QUEZADA on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 In re HENRY QUEZADA on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Connolly, Patrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5605

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Connolly, Patrick

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Henry Quezada

Blythe, CA 92226

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jennifer L. Peabody

Attorney at California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue, Ste 400

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Sydney Banach

Attorney at California Appellate Project

520 South Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Patrick Connolly

Compton Courthouse 200 West Compton Blvd, Dept. K

Compton, CA 90220

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Thomas C. Hsieh

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's reply to informal response

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Respondent: The People Attorney: Office of the Attorney General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Office of the Attorney General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered petitioner's motion to consolidate petition for writ of habeas corpus with petitioner's direct appeal no. B320608 filed on January 13, 2023. The motion is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed on January 13, 2023. On or before February 2, 2023 the Attorney General shall file an informal response, addressing the question whether an order to show cause should be issued. Petitioner may file a reply, within 20 days after the filing of the informal response. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.385(b)(3).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Proposed order - Request for Judicial Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Proposed order - Motion to Consolidate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS WITH PETITIONER'S DIRECT APPEAL NO. B320608

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less