This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/11/2022 at 00:59:59 (UTC).

In re GUILLERMO GARCIA SANCHEZ on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 In re GUILLERMO GARCIA SANCHEZ on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas, Danielle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3470

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Douglas, Danielle

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Guillermo Garcia Sanchez

Calipatria, CA 92233

Respondent

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Barry Karl

620 Jefferson Avenue

Redwood City, CA 94063

First District Appellate Project

Attorney at First District Appellate Project

475 Fourteenth Street, Suite 650

Oakland, CA 94612

Respondent Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Office Of The District Attorney

900 Ward Street

Martinez, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record returned from Supreme Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The request for judicial notice is granted. The petition for review is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court.; Notes: efile notification sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT: The petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied. Humes, P.J., Margulies, J., and Banke, J.; Author: Humes, James M.; Participants: Margulies, Sandra Lynn Banke, Kathleen M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: The petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied. Humes, P.J., Margulies, J., and Banke, J. participated in the decision.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Informal Reply to Informal Opposition to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed to:; Notes: Informal response.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Consideration of whether to issue an order to show cause herein is deferred pending consideration of the related appeal in case No. A157538. The Attorney General may serve and file points and authorities in response to the petition on or before October 4, 2021, addressed to the question of whether an order to show cause should issue, and if so, whether the Attorney General anticipates that the return and traverse will raise factual issues that require resolution at an evidentiary hearing, making this matter more appropriate for issuance of an order to show cause returnable in the superior court. (People v. Duvall (1995) 9 Cal.4th 464, 475.) Petitioner may serve and file reply points and authorities on or before October 19, 2021. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.385(b).) The parties' briefs in this matter shall be filed separately from the briefs filed in the appeal and bear the case number of this habeas corpus proceeding (case No. A163470) only. The court advises the parties that the oral argument notice issued in the companion appeal will not operate to permit oral argument on the habeas corpus petition, absent issuance of an order to show cause returnable to this court. The clerk shall file a copy of this order in case No. A157538, and serve this order upon the Deputy Attorney General assigned to case No. A157538.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits 1 - 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: 51708494; Trial Court Judge: Douglas, Danielle

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant