This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/16/2023 at 01:36:52 (UTC).

In re G.C.; CFS v. K.C. et al.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 In re G C CFS filed an Other lawsuit against K C. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pace, Annemarie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0279

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pace, Annemarie

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Appellants and Defendants

K. C.

S. R.

Not Yet Classified

G. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Johanna R. Shargel

2632 Wilshire Blvd., #284

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Tracy Marie De Soto

Attorney at Windansea Law Offices

7584 Trade Street

San Diego, CA 92121

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: supp brief re Sade C. and record on appeal (S. R.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: S. R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: S. R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned and re-sent.; Notes: Appellant K.C.'s copy of order dtd Jan 30, 2023; Time to file supplemental brief extended 30 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. order filed.; Notes: Appellants are granted 30 days to file supp briefs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: S. R. Attorney: Tracy Marie De Soto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: K. C. Attorney: Johanna R. Shargel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: amended dtd Dec 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Dec 2, 2022; S.R. (Father)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Nov 29, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Nov 29, 2022 and appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: Dtd Nov 30, 2022; Superior court received appeal on Nov 29, 2022 but was not received until end of business day. Therefore, it was not processed until Nov 30, 2022. Date has now been added and request for extension to Dec 20, 2022 is granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Nov 30, 2022; Prior E078912

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Nov 30, 2022; Out of County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Nov 30, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Nov 29, 2022; K.C. (mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J291859; Trial Court Judge: Pace, Annemarie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less