This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/28/2022 at 03:15:39 (UTC).

In re F.C.; CFS v. V.C.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 In re F C CFS filed an Other lawsuit against V C. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alexander, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9350

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alexander, Erin

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Appellant and Defendant

V. C.

Not Yet Classified

F. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Robert Barrell

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

385 North Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Michelle D. Pena

Attorney at Law Office of Michelle D. Pena

3830 Valley Centre Drive Suite 705 Pmb 706

San Diego, CA 92130

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: V. C. Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: V. C.Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: San Bernardino County Children and Family Services Attorney: Joseph Robert Barrell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: San Bernardino County Children and Family ServicesAttorney: Joseph Robert Barrell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: V. C. Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: V. C.Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel w/transmission of exhibits form.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Michelle D. Pena is appointed for appellant. AOB due date is extended to Oct 4, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (34 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (143 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Jul 22, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The motion for relief from default received with the notice of appeal is granted, and the notice of appeal filed in the superior court on Jul 11, 2022, is deemed timely filed from the juvenile court orders made on May 3, 2022. The clerk of the superior court is directed to prepare the record on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: Proposed order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Notice of appeal and minute order dtd May 3, 2022 re timeliness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jul 11, 2022; V.C. (mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J292205; Trial Court Judge: Alexander, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle D. Pena