This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/12/2021 at 14:11:58 (UTC).

In re ERICK MEDRANO on Habeas Corpus

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 In re ERICK MEDRANO on Habeas Corpus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Romero, Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5171

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Romero, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Erick Medrano

Wasco, CA 93280

Respondent

Ventura County Superior Court

Hon. Gilbert Romero 800 S. Victoria Ave.

Ventura, CA 93009

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wayne C. Tobin

1560-1 Newbury Road, #346

Newbury Park, CA 91320-3448

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

800 South Victoria Avenue 3Rd Floor Hoj

Ventura, CA 93009

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: [SEE ORDER] The petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed by Erick Medrano on September 22, 2021, is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 2015022964; Trial Court Judge: Romero, Gilbert

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT/ is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant